Global patent index - EP 1054618 A1

EP 1054618 A1 2000-11-29 - DETECTION, IMAGING AND CHARACTERIZATION OF BREAST TUMORS

Title (en)

DETECTION, IMAGING AND CHARACTERIZATION OF BREAST TUMORS

Title (de)

NACHWEIS, ABBILDUNG UND KENNZEICHNUNG VON BRUSTUMOREN

Title (fr)

DETECTION, VISUALISATION ET CARACTERISATION DE CARCINOMES MAMMAIRES

Publication

EP 1054618 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99906917 A

Priority

  • US 9902953 W
  • US 7450498 P
  • US 9801898 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9940840A1] An optical examination technique employs an optical system (15, 45, 100, 150, 200, 260 or 300) for in vivo non-invasive examination of breast tissue of a subject. The optical system includes an optical module (12 or 14), a controller and a processor. The optical module includes an array of optical input ports and optical detection ports located in a selected geometrical pattern to provide a multiplicity of photon migration paths inside the biological tissue. Each optical input port is constructed to introduce into the examined tissue visible or infrared light emitted from a light source. Each optical detection port is constructed to provide light from the tissue to a light detector. The controller is constructed and arranged to activate one or several light sources and light detectors so that the light detector detects light that has migrated over at least one of the photon migration paths. The processor receives signals corresponding to the detected light and forms at least two data sets, a first of said data sets representing blood volume in the examined tissue region and a second of said data sets representing blood oxygenation of the examined tissue. The processor is arranged to correlate the first and second data sets to detect abnormal tissue in the examined tissue.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/17 (2006.01); A61B 5/00 (2006.01); A61B 5/145 (2006.01); A61B 5/1455 (2006.01); A61B 10/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/0091 (2013.01); A61B 5/0073 (2013.01); A61B 5/14552 (2013.01); A61B 5/4312 (2013.01); A61B 2562/0233 (2013.01); A61B 2562/0242 (2013.01); A61B 2562/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9940840 A1 19990819; CA 2319454 A1 19990819; CA 2319454 C 20100427; DE 69934482 D1 20070201; DE 69934482 T2 20070927; EP 1054618 A1 20001129; EP 1054618 A4 20040714; EP 1054618 B1 20061220; JP 2002502652 A 20020129; JP 2011104427 A 20110602; JP 4733264 B2 20110727; US 2005197583 A1 20050908; US 2010160752 A1 20100624; US 7627365 B2 20091201

INPADOC legal status

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140211

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-11-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69934482

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69934482

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130311

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070921

2007-11-16 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1035120

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2007-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69934482

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-02-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-12-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041227

2004-07-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040527

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB