Global patent index - EP 1054711 A1

EP 1054711 A1 2000-11-29 - SPORTS GUARDS

Title (en)

SPORTS GUARDS

Title (de)

SPORTSCHUTZ

Title (fr)

PROTECTIONS DE SPORT

Publication

EP 1054711 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99905037 A

Priority

  • GB 9900451 W
  • GB 9802992 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9940979A1] A sports guard, such as an ankle guard, comprises a protective element (3) which is attached to the user's leg by being wrapped around the leg from behind such that an elasticated strap (4) passes beneath the instep of the user's foot (5). A flap (6) is then fastened so as to secure the guard around the user's ankle. The protective element (3) comprises medium density, open-celled polyurethane foam having high energy-absorbing properties sewn between two Neoprene layers, and the flap (6) is secured by Velcro3 strips. Such a sports guard provides efficient protection against injury whilst allowing good freedom of movement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 71/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 71/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 71/1225 (2013.01); A63B 2071/1258 (2013.01); A63B 2071/1266 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940979A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9940979 A1 19990819; AU 2534399 A 19990830; DE 69900815 D1 20020314; EP 1054711 A1 20001129; EP 1054711 B1 20020123; GB 9802992 D0 19980408

INPADOC legal status

2007-05-02 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20061016

2003-12-31 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2003-10-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2003-02-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030212

2003-02-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030212

2002-12-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SCHRAMM SPORT GMBH KWON- KAMPFSPORTAUSSTATTUNG

- Effective date: 20021022

2002-11-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2002-08-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020808

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-07-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020730

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2002-04-24 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69900815

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-14

2002-02-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT NL

2002-01-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-01-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-01-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010216

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT NL