Global Patent Index - EP 1054712 A1

EP 1054712 A1 2000-11-29 - APPARATUS DEALING PLAYING CARDS FOR PRODUCING PROGRAMMED HANDS

Title (en)

APPARATUS DEALING PLAYING CARDS FOR PRODUCING PROGRAMMED HANDS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERTEILEN VON SPIELKARTEN MIT HILFE VON PROGRAMMIERTEN DATEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DISTRIBUTEUR DE CARTES A JOUER POUR LA REALISATION DE DONNES PROGRAMMEES

Publication

EP 1054712 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99900941 A

Priority

  • FR 9900081 W
  • FR 9801988 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2774919A1] The invention concerns a reception site for randomly stacked cards to be dealt, reading means for determining the extracted card, a memory receiving predetermined hands, a display device directing the user on the recipient of the extracted card and card coding for reading the cards. The invention is characterised in that it comprises a body forming a housing provided with a first part receiving reception site for the cards to be dealt one by one towards the optical reader, said site being provided with means for pressing said cards to enable them to be dealt out one by one. The apparatus first part is ergonomically arranged to enable the user extracting the card one by one to hold in his hand the top card so as to allow subsequently by pushing the top lateral extraction of the card optical code to be read then for the card to be held and removed from the apparatus. The apparatus second part is arranged for housing the memory receiving the predetermined hands and powering means enabling the apparatus to operate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 1/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940981A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2774919 A1 19990820; FR 2774919 B1 20000407; AU 2059399 A 19990830; CA 2320834 A1 19990819; EP 1054712 A1 20001129; WO 9940981 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-08 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20011208

2001-07-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS DEALING WITH PLAYING CARDS FOR PRODUCING PROGRAMMED HANDS

2001-07-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS DEALING WITH PLAYING CARDS FOR PRODUCING PROGRAMMED HANDS

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE