Global Patent Index - EP 1054721 A1

EP 1054721 A1 2000-11-29 - METHOD FOR PRESERVING SILVER-PLATED OBJECTS AND FILTERING DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRESERVING SILVER-PLATED OBJECTS AND FILTERING DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR KONSERVIERUNG VON VERSILBERTEN OBJEKTEN UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CONSERVATION D'OBJETS ARGENTES ET APPAREIL D'EPURATION POUR SA MISE EN OEUVRE

Publication

EP 1054721 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99900931 A

Priority

  • FR 9900071 W
  • FR 9800420 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2773821A1] A method for preserving and conserving silver-plated objects (1) in which the objects (1) are placed in an atmosphere of desulfurised gas is characterized in that the gas is desulfurised by contact with cathodically activated silver metal. The apparatus used for this method of preserving and conserving a silver-plated object (1) is also claimed. The apparatus (100) is contained in an enclosure (300) in which the object (1) is placed and incorporates at least one cassette (200) containing the cathodically activated silver metal in the form of a fibre. The cassette may also incorporate other filtering substances such as activated carbon, zeolite, molecular sieves, alkaline hydroxides or carbonates, etc. Supplementary devices for controlling and measuring the atmosphere in the enclosure may also be incorporated. The method for the cathodic activation of the silver is also claimed together with the silver metal and the cassette used in the process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 53/48; C23F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23F 15/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936161A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2773821 A1 19990723; FR 2773821 B1 20000407; AT 236703 T 20030415; DE 69906705 D1 20030515; DE 69906705 T2 20031113; EP 1054721 A1 20001129; EP 1054721 B1 20030409; ES 2191410 T3 20030901; WO 9936161 A1 19990722

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160201

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160108

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160106

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160113

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-01 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2004-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-15 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040115

2003-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2191410 T3

2003-07-16 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030402325

2003-07-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2003-05-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-04-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-09 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020125

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE