Global Patent Index - EP 1054738 A1

EP 1054738 A1 2000-11-29 - MIST GENERATING HEAD

Title (en)

MIST GENERATING HEAD

Title (de)

NEBELGENERATORKOPF

Title (fr)

TETE DE GENERATEUR DE BROUILLARD

Publication

EP 1054738 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966831 A

Priority

  • DE 19806254 A
  • EP 9808311 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19806254A1] The invention relates to a mist generating head (34) comprising an injection unit (70) of the type used in diesel engines. Said head atomizes the liquid to be nebulized at a high frequency. The stream of liquid droplets emitted by the injection unit (70) is surrounded and broken up further by a gas nozzle (102) which encloses the outlet opening of the injection unit and is positioned slightly downstream of same.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 7/04; B05B 7/08; B05B 7/12; B05B 12/06; B05B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/04 (2006.01); B05B 7/08 (2006.01); B05B 7/12 (2006.01); B05B 13/02 (2006.01); B05B 12/06 (2006.01); B05B 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 13/0207 (2013.01); B05B 7/0466 (2013.01); B05B 7/0815 (2013.01); B05B 7/12 (2013.01); B05B 16/95 (2018.02); B05B 12/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19806254 A1 19990819; EP 1054738 A1 20001129; EP 1054738 B1 20031008; US 6663020 B1 20031216; WO 9941016 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59809885

- Effective date: 20130702

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120227

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040308

2004-10-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-04-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20031008

2004-01-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040119

2004-01-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040108

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809885 P 20031113

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-08 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-10-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-10-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031008

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE