Global Patent Index - EP 1054741 A1

EP 1054741 A1 2000-11-29 - INSTALLATION FOR SORTING FLAT MAIL ARTICLES

Title (en)

INSTALLATION FOR SORTING FLAT MAIL ARTICLES

Title (de)

SORTIERANLAGE FÜR FLACHES POSTGUT

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION DE TRI POUR ENVOIS POSTAUX PLATS

Publication

EP 1054741 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99913072 A

Priority

  • DE 9900416 W
  • DE 19806587 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942225A1] A sorting installation is equipped with its own collecting containers (1) into which mail articles (10) are sorted. The collecting containers (1) are automatically withdrawn from the delivery stations of the installations and conveyed on a transport path to a peripheral transfer device in which the mail articles (10) are withdrawn from the collecting containers by means of a gripper (6) and transferred into transport containers (7) of the operator of the installation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 1/02; B65H 31/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07C 1/02 (2006.01); B07C 3/00 (2006.01); B65D 6/40 (2006.01); B65H 31/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 3/008 (2013.01); B07C 1/025 (2013.01); B65H 31/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942225A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942225 A1 19990826; CN 1291120 A 20010411; EP 1054741 A1 20001129; EP 1054741 B1 20020502; US 6575306 B1 20030610

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080216

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080216

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080216

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070216

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070420

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070208

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030204

2003-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-10-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-06-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901345 20020606

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010214

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000627

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI