Global Patent Index - EP 1054744 A1

EP 1054744 A1 2000-11-29 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FORMING A WORKPIECE BY APPLICATION OF A HIGH INTERNAL PRESSURE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FORMING A WORKPIECE BY APPLICATION OF A HIGH INTERNAL PRESSURE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM INNENHOCHDRUCK-UMFORMEN EINES WERKSTÜCKES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR FORMER UNE PIECE PAR APPLICATION D'UNE PRESSION INTERIEURE ELEVEE

Publication

EP 1054744 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99906169 A

Priority

  • DE 19805172 A
  • EP 9900340 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19805172A1] The invention relates to a method and a device (1) for forming a workpiece (2) by application of a high internal pressure in a closed high-pressure forming tool (3). The workpiece is expanded by the fluidic high internal pressure created by a pressure generator and contacts the impression (9) of the forming tool (3). To improve process reliability during the forming of workpieces by application of a high internal pressure the invention provides for the high internal pressure to be applied in the form of a pressure pulsation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 26/06; B21D 26/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/02 (2011.01); B21D 26/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/037 (2013.01); B21D 26/041 (2013.01); B21D 26/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941028A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19805172 A1 19990819; DE 19805172 C2 20010607; AT 220580 T 20020815; BR 9907797 A 20001017; CA 2320096 A1 19990819; EP 1054744 A1 20001129; EP 1054744 B1 20020717; ES 2178874 T3 20030101; HU 0101218 A2 20010828; HU 0101218 A3 20010928; JP 2002502706 A 20020129; PL 342219 A1 20010521; US 6282934 B1 20010904; WO 9941028 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902034

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902034

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130121

2014-03-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140324

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130120

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130120

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130121

2013-10-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-09-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130120

2013-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 220580 T

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-09-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130328

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120223

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120131

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120216

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-05-14 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2010-05-14 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178874 T3

2002-12-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020819

2002-08-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902034 20020822

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-07-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 220580 T 20020815

2002-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011228

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000714

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE