Global Patent Index - EP 1054758 A1

EP 1054758 A1 2000-11-29 - MACHINE FOR CROSS-CUTTING LINES OF MATERIAL

Title (en)

MACHINE FOR CROSS-CUTTING LINES OF MATERIAL

Title (de)

MASCHINE ZUM QUERSCHNEIDEN VON MATERIALBAHNEN

Title (fr)

MACHINE DE COUPE TRANSVERSALE DE BANDES DE MATERIAU

Publication

EP 1054758 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966903 A

Priority

  • DE 19803522 A
  • DE 19810938 A
  • EP 9808376 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9938657A1] Known machines for cross-cutting lines of material, especially lines of paper and card, have a lower knife drum (1) and an upper knife drum (2), each drum containing at least one knife (7, 8) running in an approximately axial direction. At least one electric drive motor (21, 22) with a rotor (25, 26) and a stator (27, 28) is used for turning the knife drums (1, 2). According to the invention, the rotor (25, 26) and the knife drums (1, 2) can be connected to each other so tightly that they form a rigid part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 5/00; B26D 1/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/40 (2006.01); B26D 1/62 (2006.01); B26D 5/00 (2006.01); B26D 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 5/086 (2013.01); B26D 1/405 (2013.01); B26D 1/626 (2013.01); B26D 5/00 (2013.01); B26D 5/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938657A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9938657 A1 19990805; DE 19810938 A1 19991014; EP 1054758 A1 20001129; EP 1054758 B1 20020612; ES 2178859 T3 20030101

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2178859

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020721

2002-08-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: JAGENBERG QUERSCHNEIDER GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804469

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-18

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-06-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010912

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT