Global Patent Index - EP 1054763 A1

EP 1054763 A1 2000-11-29 - MACHINE OR ACCESSORY UNIT FOR PRODUCING FOLDED CONTAINERS, ESPECIALLY FOLDING BOXES, FROM BLANKS

Title (en)

MACHINE OR ACCESSORY UNIT FOR PRODUCING FOLDED CONTAINERS, ESPECIALLY FOLDING BOXES, FROM BLANKS

Title (de)

MASCHINE ODER ZUSATZAGGREGAT ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GEFALTETEN BEHÄLTERN, INSBESONDERE VON FALTSCHACHTELN, AUS ZUSCHNITTEN

Title (fr)

MACHINE OU APPAREIL ADDITIONNEL POUR PRODUIRE DES RECIPIENTS PLIES, NOTAMMENT DE BOITES PLIANTES, A PARTIR DE COUPES

Publication

EP 1054763 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965860 A

Priority

  • DE 19803820 A
  • EP 9808375 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19803820A1] Known methods for producing folded containers, especially folding boxes, from blanks use folding-box gluing machines and accessory units comprising machine elements (2, 6, 10, 13) for processing and/or conveying the blanks or containers, which can be manually positioned to fit different blank sizes. Measuring devices (17) for determining the actual position of the machine elements (2, 6, 10, 13) to be positioned and a memory unit for storing the desired positions for different blank sizes are also known. To be able to support a machine adjuster in the adjustment of positions the invention provides for both the memory unit for the desired positions and each measuring device (17) for the actual positions to be connected to a computing element which calculates the differences between the desired positions and the actual positions. To each machine element (2, 6, 10, 13) to be positioned a display unit (20) connected to the corresponding computing element is assigned which displays the difference between the desired position and the actual position calculated by the corresponding computing element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 1/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/00 (2013.01); B31B 2201/95 (2013.01); B31B 2203/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19803820 A1 19990805; EP 1054763 A1 20001129; EP 1054763 B1 20020821; ES 2182398 T3 20030301; JP 2002501845 A 20020122; KR 100386535 B1 20030602; TR 200002221 T2 20010122; US 6827678 B1 20041207; WO 9938676 A1 19990805

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MASTERWORK MACHINERY CO., LTD., CN

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2016-11-29 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: R079

- Ref Document Number: 59805265

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Free Format Text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B31B0001740000

- IPC: B31B0050740000

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151230

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: GLN S.A., CH

2015-07-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MASTERWORK MACHINERY CO., LTD., CN

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2015-06-24 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: MASTERWORK MACHINERY CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20150618

2015-06-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150514 AND 20150520

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MASTERWORK MACHINERY CO., LTD., CN

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59805265

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150402

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2003-11-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2003-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-07-30 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2182398

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805265

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-26

2002-09-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-09-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020821

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2002-08-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI