Global Patent Index - EP 1054771 A1

EP 1054771 A1 2000-11-29 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR TRANSPORTING A SHEET

Title (en)

METHODS AND DEVICES FOR TRANSPORTING A SHEET

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM TRANSPORT VON BOGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET DISPOSITIFS POUR TRANSPORTER UNE FEUILLE

Publication

EP 1054771 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99915469 A

Priority

  • DE 9900349 W
  • DE 19805920 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9941082A1] The present invention relates to a sheet processing machine wherein sheets are conveyed to a transport cylinder and removed therefrom twice.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/00; B41F 13/00; B41F 23/08; B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 21/00 (2006.01); B41F 23/08 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01); B41F 33/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/0032 (2013.01); B41F 21/00 (2013.01); B41F 23/08 (2013.01); B41F 33/0036 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941082A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9941082 A1 19990819; EP 1054771 A1 20001129; EP 1054771 B1 20020626; EP 1157834 A1 20011128; EP 1157834 B1 20020814; JP 2002502741 A 20020129; JP 3493179 B2 20040203; US 2002035942 A1 20020328; US 2002038608 A1 20020404; US 6332398 B1 20011225; US 6598524 B2 20030729; US 6662724 B2 20031216

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070210

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070210

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071030

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070210

2007-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2006-03-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060316

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-20 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060220

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030327

2002-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901846 20020801

2002-07-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-06-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-06-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010601

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI