Global Patent Index - EP 1054776 A2

EP 1054776 A2 2000-11-29 - USE OF ALKOXYLATED FATTY ACID LOW ALKYL ESTERS

Title (en)

USE OF ALKOXYLATED FATTY ACID LOW ALKYL ESTERS

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON ALKOXYLIERTEN FETTSÄURENIEDRIGALKYLESTERN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'ESTERS D'ALKYLE INFERIEUR D'ACIDE GRAS ALCOXYLES

Publication

EP 1054776 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98939554 A

Priority

  • DE 19728899 A
  • EP 9803963 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19728899C1] Alkoxylated lower alkyl esters of fatty acids of formula R<1>CO(CH2CHR<2>O)nR<3> (1) are useful as a solvent for colouring agents in the form of microcapsules for the production of pressure sensitive carbonless copy paper. R<1>CO = 6-22C acyl group R<2> = H, CH3 R<3> = 1-4C alkyl n = 1-10.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/165

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/165 (2006.01); B41M 5/136 (2006.01); B41M 5/145 (2006.01); B41M 5/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/1655 (2013.01); B41M 5/1366 (2013.01); B41M 5/145 (2013.01); B41M 5/1455 (2013.01); B41M 5/15 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902349A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 19728899 C1 19981022; EP 1054776 A2 20001129; EP 1054776 B1 20020410; WO 9902349 A2 19990121; WO 9902349 A3 20000928

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110621

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-01-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010607

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991221

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): FR