Global Patent Index - EP 1054780 A1

EP 1054780 A1 2000-11-29 - RING BINDER MECHANISM

Title (en)

RING BINDER MECHANISM

Title (de)

RINGBUCHMECHANIK

Title (fr)

MECANISME DE CLASSEUR

Publication

EP 1054780 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99901561 A

Priority

  • CH 9900053 W
  • CH 30198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9939920A1] The invention relates to a ring binder mechanism with at least two rings consisting of at least two ring elements (2, 3). The ring elements (2, 3) are pivotally fixed on a pad (1) so that the end zones (9, 10) of said ring elements (2, 3) contact each other in a closed end position. The ring elements (2, 3) are made of plastic and are fixed on the pad (1) by means hinge elements (11). This enable simple and cost-effective large-scale production of ring binder mechanisms.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42F 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 13/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42F 13/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9939920A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9939920 A1 19990812; AU 2147399 A 19990823; AU 748380 B2 20020606; CA 2319369 A1 19990812; CH 692495 A5 20020715; DE 59902036 D1 20020822; EP 1054780 A1 20001129; EP 1054780 B1 20020717; JP 2002502728 A 20020129

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060205

2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-02-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060205

2005-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-01-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050121

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050113

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030422

2002-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902036

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-22

2002-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020718

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2002-07-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENERAL BINDING CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010907

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI