Global Patent Index - EP 1054808 A1

EP 1054808 A1 2000-11-29 - A METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A FILLING AND EMPTYING OPENING FOR A LIQUID PACKING CONTAINER

Title (en)

A METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A FILLING AND EMPTYING OPENING FOR A LIQUID PACKING CONTAINER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER ÖFFNUNG ZUM FÜLLEN UND ENTLEEREN EINES FLÜSSIGKEITS VERPACKUNGSBEHÄLTERS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ORIFICE DE REMPLISSAGE ET DE VIDAGE UTILE POUR UN CONTENEUR DE CONDITIONNEMENT DE LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 1054808 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98949018 A

Priority

  • FI 9800810 W
  • FI 974024 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9920531A1] The invention relates to a method of making a fill opening and/or pour spout on a packaging container intended for liquid substances. In the method, a hole of predetermined size and shape is formed on a basic laminate (2), comprising a support layer (3) of fibre-based material and a first thermoplastic layer (4), of a packaging laminate (1), which hole is covered on the side comprising the first thermoplastic layer (4) with a second thermoplastic layer (7), the surface opposite to the first thermoplastic layer (4) of the support laminate is laminated with a third thermoplastic layer (6), the second and the third thermoplastic layers (7, 6) are attached to one another at the area of the hole with the help of heat and pressure, and a fill opening and/or pour spout is formed centrally in view of the hole in the support laminate so that at least a part of the thermoplastic layers (7, 6) attached to one another remains covering the untreated edge (5) of the hole. According to the invention, the second thermoplastic layer (7) is laminated over the entire support laminate (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 61/18 (2006.01); B65D 5/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/70 (2013.01); B65B 61/186 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9920531A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9920531 A1 19990429; DE 69823234 D1 20040519; DE 69823234 T2 20050428; EP 1054808 A1 20001129; EP 1054808 B1 20040414; FI 104811 B 20000414; FI 974024 A0 19971022; FI 974024 A 19990423

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161102

2017-07-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69823234

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151102

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-03-20 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-03-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-04-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-06-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041019

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-12-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041019

2004-07-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040725

2004-07-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69823234 P 20040519

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-04-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030123

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000511

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE