Global patent index - EP 1054820 A1

EP 1054820 A1 2000-11-29 - PUMP OR VALVE DISPENSING HEAD

Title (en)

PUMP OR VALVE DISPENSING HEAD

Title (de)

PUMPEN-AUSGABEKOPF ODER VENTIL-AUSGABEKOPF

Title (fr)

TETE DE DISTRIBUTION DE POMPE OU DE VALVE

Publication

EP 1054820 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99901653 A

Priority

  • FR 9900178 W
  • FR 9801216 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2774367A1] The invention concerns a dispensing head (1) designed to be mounted on the valve stem of a device dispensing a fluid product such as a pump or a valve, said spray head (1) comprising a body (2) provided with a housing (21) for receiving the valve stem, with at least a conduit (22) communicating said housing (21) with a dispensing orifice (54; 35), characterised in that the body (2) is fixedly received in an overcapsule (3) covering it while leaving the housing (21) clear.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/34 (2006.01); B65D 83/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/3436 (2013.01); B65D 83/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9939992A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2774367 A1 19990806; FR 2774367 B1 20000324; DE 69901880 D1 20020725; DE 69901880 T2 20030220; EP 1054820 A1 20001129; EP 1054820 B1 20020619; ES 2178376 T3 20021216; US 6533196 B1 20030318; WO 9939992 A1 19990812

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69901880

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69901880

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150114

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150115

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150109

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-27 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20141121

2014-11-04 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20141029

2013-10-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69901880

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-10-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69901880

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-10-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69901880

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-10-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69901880

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-08-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69901880

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

2013-02-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20130104

2003-06-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030320

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2178376

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-07-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69901880

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-25

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-06-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: ATOMIZER-HEAD FOR A PUMP OR A VALVE

2001-10-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: ATOMIZER-HEAD FOR A PUMP OR A VALVE

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010719

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT