Global Patent Index - EP 1054849 A1

EP 1054849 A1 2000-11-29 - PRE-IGNITION POWDERS FOR THERMAL FUSES OF AIRBAG GAS GENERATORS

Title (en)

PRE-IGNITION POWDERS FOR THERMAL FUSES OF AIRBAG GAS GENERATORS

Title (de)

FRÜHZÜNDPULVER FÜR THERMISCHE SICHERUNGEN FÜR AIRBAG-GASGENERATOREN

Title (fr)

POUDRES A ALLUMAGE SPONTANE POUR COUPE-CIRCUITS THERMIQUES DE GENERATEURS DE GAZ POUR AIRBAGS

Publication

EP 1054849 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99913070 A

Priority

  • DE 9900414 W
  • DE 19805976 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19805976C1] The invention relates to pre-ignition powders for thermal fuses which are able to ignite the gas-generating mixtures generally used in gas generators in a thermally controlled manner and well below the critical temperature. In addition, the inventive powders exhibit a loss in weight of less than 3 % during a warm storage at 107 DEG C and for periods longer than 400 hours while preserving complete functional capacity. The pre-ignition powders contain at least one fuel selected from the group comprised of thiourea and the derivatives thereof, at least one oxidant and at least one stabilizer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06D 5/00 (2006.01); C06C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06C 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941213A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19805976 C1 19990429; AT 216985 T 20020515; AU 3136699 A 19990830; CZ 20002897 A3 20010214; CZ 292350 B6 20030917; EP 1054849 A1 20001129; EP 1054849 B1 20020502; JP 2002503624 A 20020205; WO 9941213 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050211

2004-02-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040219

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040211

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040210

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030204

2003-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-10-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901347 20020606

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SERVOPATENT GMBH

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-05-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 216985 T 20020515

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000725

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI