Global patent index - EP 1054896 A1

EP 1054896 A1 2000-11-29 - ANALGESIC PEPTIDES FROM VENOM OF GRAMMOSTOLA SPATULATA AND USE THEREOF

Title (en)

ANALGESIC PEPTIDES FROM VENOM OF GRAMMOSTOLA SPATULATA AND USE THEREOF

Title (de)

ANALGETISCHE PEPTIDE VOM GIFT DER GRAMMOSTOLA SPATULATA UND DEREN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

PEPTIDES ANALGESIQUES EXTRAITS DU VENIN DE LA GRAMMOSTOLA SPATULATA ET LEUR UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1054896 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98905534 A

Priority

GB 9800534 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942480A1] The present invention provides novel methods of treating pain comprising administering to a mammal in need of such treatment an effective analgesic amount of a peptide having the amino acid sequence Tyr-Cys-Gln-Lys-Trp-Leu-Trp-Thr-Cys-Asp-Ser-Glu-Arg-Lys-Cys-Cys-Glu-Asp-Met-Val-Cys-Arg-Leu-Trp-Cys-Lys-Lys-Arg -Leu-NH2 (SEQ ID NO:1) or Tyr-Cys-Gln-Lys-Trp-Met-Trp-Thr-Cys-Asp-Glu-Glu-Arg-Lys-Cys-Cys-Glu-Gly-Leu-Val-Cys-Arg-Leu -Trp-Cys-Lys-Lys-Lys-Ile-Glu-Trp (SEQ ID NO:2). The invention further provides a purified peptide having the amino acid sequence of SEQ ID NO:1. The peptides of SEQ ID NO:1 and SEQ ID NO:2 can also be used in methods for identifying compounds having analgesia-inducing activity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/435; A61K 38/17; C07K 16/18; G01N 33/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); A61K 38/16 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/435 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/43518 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942480A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942480 A1 19990826; AU 6109698 A 19990906; CA 2319038 A1 19990826; EP 1054896 A1 20001129; JP 2002509080 A 20020326

INPADOC legal status

2006-06-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051119

2004-08-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: ANALGESIC PEPTIDES FROM VENOM OF GRAMMOSTOLA SPATULATA AND USE THEREOF

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040202

2001-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASTRAZENECA AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE