Global Patent Index - EP 1054949 A1

EP 1054949 A1 2000-11-29 - ADVANCED ACTIVE DEVICES AND METHODS FOR MOLECULAR BIOLOGICAL ANALYSIS AND DIAGNOSTICS

Title (en)

ADVANCED ACTIVE DEVICES AND METHODS FOR MOLECULAR BIOLOGICAL ANALYSIS AND DIAGNOSTICS

Title (de)

FORTSCHRITTLICHE, AKTIVE EINRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR MOLEKULAREN, BIOLOGISCHEN ANALYSE UND DIAGNOSE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIFS ACTIFS EVOLUES ET PROCEDES D'ANALYSE ET DE DIAGNOSTIC EN BIOLOGIE MOLECULAIRE

Publication

EP 1054949 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99908135 A

Priority

  • US 9903080 W
  • US 2661898 A
  • US 23956999 A
  • US 24092099 A
  • US 23959899 A
  • US 24048999 A
  • US 24093199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942558A1] Methods of manufacture and devices for performing active biological operations utilize various structures to advantageously collect and provide charged biological materials to an array of microlocations. In one embodiment, a device includes focusing electrodes to aid in the direction and transport of materials from a collection electrode to an array. Preferably, one or more intermediate transportation electrodes are utilized, most preferably of monotonically decreasing size between the collection electrode and the array, so as to reduce current density mismatches. In another aspect, a flow cell is utilized over devices to provide containment of solution containing materials to be analyzed. In yet another embodiment, a concentric ring design is provided. Various flip-chip embodiments are disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12M 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12M 1/40 (2006.01); G01N 27/447 (2006.01); B01J 19/00 (2006.01); B01L 3/00 (2006.01); C12M 1/42 (2006.01); G01N 37/00 (2006.01); G11C 13/02 (2006.01); G11C 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11C 13/0019 (2013.01); B01L 3/502707 (2013.01); B01L 3/502761 (2013.01); B82Y 10/00 (2013.01); G11C 13/0014 (2013.01); G11C 19/00 (2013.01); H01L 29/6656 (2013.01); B01L 3/502715 (2013.01); B01L 2200/0647 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0636 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0645 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0877 (2013.01); B01L 2400/0403 (2013.01); H01L 2924/0002 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

H01L 2924/0002 + H01L 2924/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942558 A1 19990826; AU 2763899 A 19990906; AU 742960 B2 20020117; BR 9909207 A 20011106; CA 2320798 A1 19990826; CA 2320798 C 20080115; CN 1237165 C 20060118; CN 1296525 A 20010523; EP 1054949 A1 20001129; EP 1054949 A4 20060927; JP 2003524750 A 20030819; NZ 506204 A 20030630

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080925

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070918

2006-09-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060825

2006-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12M 1/40 20060101AFI19990908BHEP

2006-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B01J 19/00 20060101ALI20060531BHEP

2006-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B01L 3/00 20060101ALI20060531BHEP

2001-03-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ACKLEY, DONALD, E.

2001-03-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SWANSON, PAUL, D.

2001-03-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRAHAM, SCOTT, O.

2001-03-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MATHER, ELIZABETH, L.

2001-03-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LECLAIR,TIMOTHY L.

2001-03-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUTLER, WILLIAM, F.

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000919

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE