Global patent index - EP 1054954 A1

EP 1054954 A1 2000-11-29 - DEVELOPMENT OF REGULATORY CELLS AS A MEANS FOR TREATING AUTOIMMUNE DISEASE

Title (en)

DEVELOPMENT OF REGULATORY CELLS AS A MEANS FOR TREATING AUTOIMMUNE DISEASE

Title (de)

ENTWICKLUNG VON REGULIERENDEN ZELLEN ALS MITTEL FÜR BEHANDLUNG VON AUTOIMMUNKRANKHEITEN

Title (fr)

MISE AU POINT DE CELLULES DE REGULATION COMME INSTRUMENT DE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES AUTO-IMMUNES

Publication

EP 1054954 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99902470 A

Priority

  • CA 9900069 W
  • US 7285898 P
  • US 7287798 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9938953A1] A population of mammalian T-cells enriched in cells which have a cytokine production profile characteristic of Th2-like cells (IL-4 production, etc.) is produced by culturing T-cells, including thymocytes, in a conditioned medium (CM), which is prepared by culturing mammalian cells such as peripheral blood cells in the presence of plant mitogens. The proliferation and differentiation to single positive T-cells is promoted by the presence of IL-4 in the culture medium. The enriched population of IL-4 producing T-cells according to the invention show potential use as a source of cells for cell therapy in treating IL-4 response related disorders including certain autoimmune conditions such as diabetes mellitus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/071 (2010.01); C12N 5/078 (2010.01); A61K 35/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/0008 (2013.01); C12N 5/0648 (2013.01); C12N 5/065 (2013.01); A61K 2035/122 (2013.01); A61K 2039/57 (2013.01); C12N 2501/59 (2013.01); C12N 2502/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938953A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9938953 A1 19990805; AU 2260699 A 19990816; AU 756716 B2 20030123; CA 2319666 A1 19990805; EP 1054954 A1 20001129

INPADOC legal status

2004-11-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040503

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031219

2002-07-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEMOSOL INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BELL, DAVID

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DELOVITCH, TERRY

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GAO, JIAN-XIN

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000828

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE