Global patent index - EP 1054970 A1

EP 1054970 A1 2000-11-29 - POLLEN SPECIFIC PROMOTER

Title (en)

POLLEN SPECIFIC PROMOTER

Title (de)

POLLEN SPEZIFISCHER PROMOTOR

Title (fr)

PROMOTEUR SPECIFIQUE AU POLLEN

Publication

EP 1054970 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99902660 A

Priority

  • GB 9900232 W
  • GB 9803661 A
  • GB 9803660 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942587A1] A recombinant nucleic acid which comprises a promoter sequence of the ZmC5 gene in maize, or a variant or fragment thereof, which acts as a promoter in pollen. The DNA sequence of the promoter is depicted in figure 5. Expression cassettes and expression systems as well as transformation methods, transformed plants including the promoter sequence of the invention are also claimed. The nucleic acid may be used inter alia in the production of male sterile plants and/or hybrids as well as in the transformation of pollen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/29; A01H 5/00; C12N 15/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/415 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/29 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/415 (2013.01); C12N 15/8231 (2013.01); C12N 15/8238 (2013.01); C12N 15/8289 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942587A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942587 A1 19990826; AU 2287699 A 19990906; AU 751438 B2 20020815; BR 9907997 A 20001024; CA 2319079 A1 19990826; CN 1301300 A 20010627; DZ 2725 A1 20030901; EP 1054970 A1 20001129; HU 0100787 A2 20020429; HU 0100787 A3 20030428; IL 137971 D0 20011031; JP 2002504335 A 20020212

INPADOC legal status

2006-10-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060424

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040402

2002-09-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE