Global Patent Index - EP 1054987 A1

EP 1054987 A1 2000-11-29 - INSECTICIDAL PEPTIDES

Title (en)

INSECTICIDAL PEPTIDES

Title (de)

INSEKTIZIDE PEPTIDE

Title (fr)

PEPTIDES INSECTICIDES

Publication

EP 1054987 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99905050 A

Priority

  • GB 9900465 W
  • GB 9803361 A
  • GB 9828638 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9941393A1] Insecticidal peptides comprising the amino acid sequence CX<1>X<2>X<3>RECGSCX<4>CNX<5>WKGKCEX<6> (SEQ ID NO 1), where X<1>, X<2>, X<3>, X<4>, X<5> and X<6> are any amino acid; or a fragment thereof, or a homologue or variant or derivative of any of these are described and claimed together with nucleotide sequences encoding these peptides. They may be applied as insecticidal compounds in the form of compositions, or expressed in host cells in particular plant cells. Transgenic plants which express peptides of the invention are described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/82; A01H 5/00; C07K 14/37; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/37 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/8286 (2013.01); C07K 14/37 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941393A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9941393 A1 19990819; AU 2535599 A 19990830; EP 1054987 A1 20001129

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040326

2002-09-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE