Global Patent Index - EP 1054998 A1

EP 1054998 A1 2000-11-29 - TRANSGLUTAMINASE LINKAGE OF AGENTS TO TISSUE

Title (en)

TRANSGLUTAMINASE LINKAGE OF AGENTS TO TISSUE

Title (de)

TRANSGLUTAMINASE-VERBINDUNG VON MITTELN ZUM GEWEBE

Title (fr)

LIAISON D'AGENTS AU TISSU PAR TRANSGLUTAMINASE

Publication

EP 1054998 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99902394 A

Priority

  • US 9901193 W
  • US 7190898 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9936570A2] Methods, products and kits are provided for attaching agents to body tissues using transglutaminase.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/52; A61K 7/48; A61K 38/45

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/52 (2006.01); A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/02 (2006.01); A61K 8/37 (2006.01); A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61K 8/60 (2006.01); A61K 8/64 (2006.01); A61K 8/66 (2006.01); A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/45 (2006.01); A61K 38/48 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 47/42 (2006.01); A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); A61Q 3/02 (2006.01); A61Q 5/00 (2006.01); A61Q 5/12 (2006.01); A61Q 17/04 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01); C07K 17/02 (2006.01); C12N 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/48146 (2013.01); A61K 8/0208 (2013.01); A61K 8/37 (2013.01); A61K 8/49 (2013.01); A61K 8/602 (2013.01); A61K 8/64 (2013.01); A61K 8/66 (2013.01); A61K 38/45 (2013.01); A61K 47/48338 (2013.01); A61K 47/48353 (2013.01); A61Q 5/12 (2013.01); A61Q 17/04 (2013.01); A61Q 19/00 (2013.01); B82Y 5/00 (2013.01); A61K 2800/57 (2013.01); A61K 2800/70 (2013.01); A61K 2800/88 (2013.01); A61K 2800/94 (2013.01); Y10S 530/812 (2013.01); Y10S 977/926 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936570A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9936570 A2 19990722; WO 9936570 A3 19990923; CA 2318661 A1 19990722; EP 1054998 A1 20001129; JP 2002509160 A 20020326; JP 2007126487 A 20070524; JP 3981525 B2 20070926; US 6267957 B1 20010731

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130801

2011-06-17 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1033962

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020218

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020218

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GREEN, HOWARD

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COREY, GEORGE D.

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMPTON, BRUCE J.

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DJIAN, PHILIPPE

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GREEN, HOWARD

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: COREY, GEORGE D.

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: COMPTON, BRUCE J.

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DJIAN, PHILIPPE

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000801

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE