Global Patent Index - EP 1055003 A1

EP 1055003 A1 2000-11-29 - METHODS FOR CHARACTERISING mRNA MOLECULES

Title (en)

METHODS FOR CHARACTERISING mRNA MOLECULES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG VON mRNA-MOLEKÜLEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR CARACTERISER DES MOLECULES D'ARNm

Publication

EP 1055003 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99908907 A

Priority

  • DE 19806431 A
  • EP 9900992 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942610A1] The invention relates to methods for the qualitative and quantitative determination of differentially expressed mRNA molecules. Said methods are used especially to determine if possible all mRNA molecules present in a cell or a tissue, and to compare them with other cells or tissues or with other conditions (stages of disease or development) or stages of treatment for same. The method provided for in the invention therefore makes it possible, for example, to establish a comprehensive map of the different mRNA molecules present in a defined mRNA population and subsequently to use the preferably digital information obtained in this way in data base analyses.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/10 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6855 (2013.01); C12N 15/1096 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6809 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C12Q 1/6809 + C12Q 2525/191 + C12Q 2521/301 + C12Q 2521/107

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942610A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942610 A1 19990826; AU 2834299 A 19990906; CA 2322068 A1 19990826; DE 19806431 C1 19991014; EP 1055003 A1 20001129; JP 2002504348 A 20020212; JP 3533373 B2 20040531; US 6670121 B1 20031230

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-07-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050609

2001-06-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BIOFRONTERA PHARMACEUTICALS AG

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BIOFRONTERA PHARMACEUTICALS AG

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS-ERFINDUNGEN VERWALTUNGSGESELLSCHAFT M.B.

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000826

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE