Global Patent Index - EP 1055025 A1

EP 1055025 A1 2000-11-29 - FOLDING IRONING BOARD

Title (en)

FOLDING IRONING BOARD

Title (de)

AUSKLAPPBARER BÜGELTISCH

Title (fr)

TABLE A REPASSER PLIABLE

Publication

EP 1055025 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99905361 A

Priority

  • NL 9900072 W
  • NL 1008293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9941444A1] Folding ironing board (1), especially a domestic ironing board, comprising an ironing board table (5), a supporting frame having leg elements (11, 13) which can be swivelled between a folded and an unfolded position, a locking mechanism for locking the position of the ironing board table in the unfolded position and at a safe working height above a floor and comprising a first locking element (17) connected to the ironing board table as well as a second locking element which can be moved relative to the said first locking element and interacts with one of the leg elements (13), and a control member (31) for unlocking the adjusting mechanism, which control member can be moved by a user manually from a locking position into an unlocking position. The control member can be jammed in the locking position. The control member (33) can be jammed in the locking positions. The control member can comprise a control handle (31) and the underside of the ironing board table (5) and can be moved counter to spring force in the direction of the bottom edge of the ironing board table and a jamming member can be present which is manually displaceable into a jamming position in which the space between the control handle and the underside of the ironing board table is locally, in any event partially, filled, so that a movement of the control handle counter to spring force in the direction of the bottom edge of the ironing board table is prevented to such an extent that the locking mechanism is prevented from being unlocked.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 81/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 81/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 81/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941444A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9941444 A1 19990819; AU 2551899 A 19990830; DE 69903130 D1 20021031; DE 69903130 T2 20030430; DK 1055025 T3 20021230; EP 1055025 A1 20001129; EP 1055025 B1 20020925; NL 1008293 C2 19990816

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050211

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-09-27 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BRABANTIA NEDERLAND B.V.

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-03-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040211

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030306

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030224

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030219

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-04 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030204

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030131

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030124

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903130 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010807

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL