Global Patent Index - EP 1055029 A1

EP 1055029 A1 2000-11-29 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF STABLE AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS FOR SIZING PAPER

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF STABLE AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS FOR SIZING PAPER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON STABILEN, WÄSSRIGEN DISPERSIONEN FÜR DIE PAPIERLEIMUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DES DISPERSIONS AQUEUSES STABLES DESTINEES AU COLLAGE DU PAPIER

Publication

EP 1055029 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99901497 A

Priority

  • AT 9900019 W
  • AT 11898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6380299B1] A method for preparing a paper sizing agent which has improved retention on paper and which is an aqueous dispersion stabilized with a polymer, including the steps of (a) dispersing a resin which is one of a colophonium resin or a compound derived from a colophonium resin in water containing a synthetic emulsifier present in an amount which is a minimal amount effective to prepare a metastable dispersion of the resin so that impairment of sizing action by the synthetic emulsifier is minimized; (b) immediately cooling the metastable dispersion to a cooled temperature; and (c) reacting the metastable dispersion while at a cooled temperature with a polymer which is one of a polymer solution or a polymer dispersion to form a stable dispersion, wherein direct dispersion of the polymer with the resin is avoided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 17/71; C08J 3/03; D21H 17/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 3/03 (2006.01); C08K 5/1539 (2006.01); D21H 21/16 (2006.01); D21H 17/14 (2006.01); D21H 17/16 (2006.01); D21H 17/17 (2006.01); D21H 17/29 (2006.01); D21H 17/60 (2006.01); D21H 17/62 (2006.01); D21H 17/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08J 3/03 (2013.01); C08K 5/1539 (2013.01); D21H 21/16 (2013.01); C08J 2393/00 (2013.01); D21H 17/14 (2013.01); D21H 17/16 (2013.01); D21H 17/17 (2013.01); D21H 17/29 (2013.01); D21H 17/60 (2013.01); D21H 17/62 (2013.01); D21H 17/66 (2013.01); D21H 17/72 (2013.01); D21H 17/74 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08K 5/1539 + C08L 93/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937857A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6380299 B1 20020430; AT 406492 B 20000525; AT A11898 A 19991015; BR 9907261 A 20001114; CA 2319124 A1 19990729; EP 1055029 A1 20001129; WO 9937857 A1 19990729

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-08-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF STABLE AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS FOR SIZING PAPER

2004-04-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KEMIRA CHEMIE GES.MBH

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030909

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE