Global patent index - EP 1055042 A1

EP 1055042 A1 2000-11-29 - MULTIPLE PEAK CABLE TENT

Title (en)

MULTIPLE PEAK CABLE TENT

Title (de)

SPANNKABELZELT MIT MEHREREN SPITZEN

Title (fr)

TENTE SUR CABLES A PLUSIEURS SOMMETS

Publication

EP 1055042 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99904664 A

Priority

  • CA 9900132 W
  • CA 2229401 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9941473A1] A multiple peak tent (1) structure which is mechanically simple and easy to assemble. The tent structure of this invention can span relatively large areas without inhibiting mobility under the tent through the use of ground extending support poles. The canopy (3) of the multiple peak tent (1) structure is supported by multiple masts (8) resting on a cable network (11). The cable network (11) is attached to the upper corners of the frame structure resulting in a tent having no supporting poles that extend to the ground in the covered area. The multiple peak tent (1) structure may be expanded modularly to span larger areas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 15/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/14 (2006.01); E04H 15/18 (2006.01); E04H 15/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 15/18 (2013.01); E04B 7/14 (2013.01); E04H 15/644 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941473A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9941473 A1 19990819; AU 2507799 A 19990830; CA 2229401 A1 19990813; DE 69919987 D1 20041014; DE 69919987 T2 20050120; EP 1055042 A1 20001129; EP 1055042 B1 20040908

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120228

2012-12-20 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69919987

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TENTNOLOGY LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20120228

2011-07-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110224

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110216

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110315

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110216

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69919987

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030909

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB