Global Patent Index - EP 1055052 A1

EP 1055052 A1 2000-11-29 - METHOD OF RECOGNITION OF A SHAFT RUPTURE IN A TURBO-ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD OF RECOGNITION OF A SHAFT RUPTURE IN A TURBO-ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ERKENNEN EINES WELLENBRUCHES IN EINER STRÖMUNGSKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR IDENTIFIER UNE RUPTURE D'ARBRE DANS UNE TURBOMACHINE

Publication

EP 1055052 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99955983 A

Priority

  • DE 19857552 A
  • EP 9908717 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19857552A1] The invention relates to a method of recognition of a shaft rupture in a turbo-engine with the purpose of initiating a suitable speed range limiting measure, especially an emergency shut-down of the fuel supply in a gas turbine system of an aircraft. According to the inventive method, a torque-supplying turbine rotor and a torque-absorbing unit are linked with one another via the shaft (3) which is to be monitored for a rupture and the ends of which are arranged on at least two roller bearings (6, 7). The rotary frequencies (fn1, fn2) of the two ends of the shaft in the roller bearings (6, 7) of the shaft (3) are detected and compared continuously and substantially in real time. If the rotary frequency (fn1) at the roller bearing (7) at the turbine rotor's end is higher than the rotary frequency (fn2) at the roller bearing (6) of the torque-absorbing unit, rupture of the shaft (3) is assumed. Preferably, the rotary frequency of the respective end of the shaft is determined via fast-Fourier transmission and an arithmetic processor for both roller bearings (6, 7) via separate measuring channels. The measurement is based on one or several typical roller bearing frequencies that are emitted by said roller bearings when they rotate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 21/00; F01D 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 21/00 (2006.01); F01D 21/02 (2006.01); F01D 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 21/045 (2013.01); F01D 21/00 (2013.01); F01D 21/02 (2013.01); F05D 2270/021 (2013.01); F05D 2270/09 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0036280A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19857552 A1 20000615; EP 1055052 A1 20001129; EP 1055052 B1 20040602; US 6494046 B1 20021217; WO 0036280 A1 20000622

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101112

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-08-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909646

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101112

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091201

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091125

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091127

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-09-16 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2005-09-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-09-16 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2005-05-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050303

2005-02-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-09-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND LTD & CO KG

2004-08-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909646 P 20040708

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-06-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030626

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE