Global Patent Index - EP 1055062 A1

EP 1055062 A1 2000-11-29 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1055062 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99957931 A

Priority

  • DE 9903371 W
  • DE 19857244 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19857244A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection valve for internal combustion engines, comprising a valve member (7) that can be axially displaced in a guide bore (5) of a valve body (1), said valve member having two guide sections serving to slide said member in the guide bore (5). The first top guide section is provided on the end of the valve member (7) opposite the combustion chamber and the second bottom guide section (25) is provided in the area of the valve member (7) close to the combustion chamber. The bottom guide section (25) separates an annular gap (29) that is formed between the valve member shaft and the wall of the guide bore (5) and that is connected to a high pressure fuel admission duct of a pressure chamber (31) located underneath and leading to the valve seat surface (11) when the fuel injection valve is closed and controls said connection when the valve member (7) is opened by a lifting motion. Said valve also comprises a throttle connecting section between the annular gap (29) and the pressure chamber (31) located underneath. Said throttle cross section is configured as a throttle hole (41).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/04; F02M 45/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/10 (2006.01); F02M 45/12 (2006.01); F02M 61/04 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/12 (2013.01); F02M 61/042 (2013.01); F02M 2200/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0036294A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19857244 A1 20000615; EP 1055062 A1 20001129; EP 1055062 B1 20040929; ES 2229794 T3 20050416; JP 2002532652 A 20021002; US 6422208 B1 20020723; WO 0036294 A1 20000622

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071021

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051006

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061023

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061023

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061021

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061021

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051019

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051006

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-07-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2229794 T3

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050116

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910654 P 20041104

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030225

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE