Global Patent Index - EP 1055064 A1

EP 1055064 A1 2000-11-29 - DEVICE FOR ASSEMBLING AND DISMANTLING A FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ASSEMBLING AND DISMANTLING A FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

MONTAGEVORRICHTUNG ZUR MONTAGE UND DEMONTAGE EINES BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTILS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LE MONTAGE ET LE DEMONTAGE D'UNE SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1055064 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99973424 A

Priority

  • DE 9903144 W
  • DE 19857474 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19857474A1] A device (1) for assembling and dismantling a fuel injection valve (2) in a receiving bore hole (3) of a cylinder head (4) in an internal combustion engine. The inventive device consists of two engaging elements (9, 10) that engage with the fuel injection valve (2). A respective downwards holding surface is formed on the elastic engaging elements (9, 10) in order to transmit a downwards holding force to the fuel injection valve (2), in addition to a recess (17, 18) with which an engaging lug (19, 20) of the fuel injection valve (2) engages in order to transmit a dismantling force to the fuel injection valve (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/24 (2006.01); F02M 61/14 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/14 (2013.01); Y10T 137/6109 (2015.04); Y10T 137/6116 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0036296A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19857474 A1 20000615; EP 1055064 A1 20001129; EP 1055064 B1 20040324; JP 2002532654 A 20021002; US 6553969 B1 20030429; WO 0036296 A1 20000622

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908954

- Effective date: 20120403

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-09-27 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-09-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040917

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040915

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908954 P 20040429

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI