Global Patent Index - EP 1055065 A1

EP 1055065 A1 2000-11-29 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1055065 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99955711 A

Priority

  • DE 9902931 W
  • DE 19856920 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19856920A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection valve comprising an excitable actuating device (10, 11, 12), a valve needle (5) that is moved axially by the actuating device (10, 11, 12) and which is connected to a valve closing body (7). Said valve closing body (7) cooperates with a valve seat surface (29) to open and close the valve. A perforated disk (21) is mounted downstream from the valve seat surface (29), which is cup or pot-shaped and has a bottom part (22) and a retaining edge (26) protruding therefrom. The thin perforated disk (21) consisting of a sheet metal has bulgings (36) in the transition area from the bottom part (22) to the retaining edge (26) to enhance the rigidity of the perforated disk (21). The fuel injection valve is particularly suitable for fuel injection systems in mixture-compressing, spark-ignited internal combustion engines.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/08 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/1853 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0034648A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19856920 A1 20000615; AU 1260000 A 20000626; AU 748415 B2 20020606; BR 9907833 A 20001024; CN 1116516 C 20030730; CN 1292848 A 20010425; EP 1055065 A1 20001129; EP 1055065 B1 20040225; JP 2002531770 A 20020924; RU 2230216 C2 20040610; US 6371391 B1 20020416; WO 0034648 A1 20000615

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050915

2005-09-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050915

2005-09-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050915

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-10-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-09-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040917

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040902

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-06-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908651 P 20040401

2004-03-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE