Global Patent Index - EP 1055070 B1

EP 1055070 B1 2002-12-04 - LOW NOISE HIGH PERFORMANCE VACUUM PUMP

Title (en)

LOW NOISE HIGH PERFORMANCE VACUUM PUMP

Title (de)

GERÄUSCHARME VAKUUMPUMPE MIT HOHEM WIRKUNGSGRAD

Title (fr)

POMPE A VIDE A FAIBLE BRUIT ET RENDEMENT ELEVE

Publication

EP 1055070 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99902628 A

Priority

  • FR 9900284 W
  • FR 9801664 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2774727A1] The invention concerns a vacuum pump comprising two cylinders (1, 2) wherein the respective pistons (3, 4) define respective volumes (V1, V2) which increase during the suction phase and decrease during the discharge phase. The invention is characterised in that the cylinders (1, 2) are symmetrically aligned with each other relative to the main axis X, and the pistons (3, 4) are driven, for example by a cam (5), such that the suction phase, which corresponds to an angular rotation A1 of the cam, lasts longer than the discharge phase, which corresponds to an angular rotation A2 of the cam.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 37/14; F04B 27/02; F04B 27/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/02 (2006.01); F04B 27/04 (2006.01); F04B 35/01 (2006.01); F04B 37/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 37/14 (2013.01); F04B 27/02 (2013.01); F04B 27/0414 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2774727 A1 19990813; FR 2774727 B1 20000421; DE 69904299 D1 20030116; DE 69904299 T2 20030821; EP 1055070 A1 20001129; EP 1055070 B1 20021204; ES 2189384 T3 20030701; JP 2002503786 A 20020205; JP 4172005 B2 20081029; WO 9941501 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110209

2012-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110208

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110208

2011-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BOSCH SYSTEMES DE FREINAGE

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100224

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100315

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090417

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2189384 T3

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904299 20030116

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011112

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB