Global Patent Index - EP 1055071 A1

EP 1055071 A1 2000-11-29 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR A MEMBRANE PUMP

Title (en)

CONTROL DEVICE FOR A MEMBRANE PUMP

Title (de)

REGELVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE MEMBRANPUMPE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE D'UNE POMPE A MEMBRANE

Publication

EP 1055071 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99950623 A

Priority

  • DE 29821910 U
  • EP 9907399 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0034659A1] The invention relates to a control device for a membrane pump for feeding a filter press or similar consumers. The inventive device comprises an electric three-phase motor for driving the pump. Said motor is linked with the supply system via a frequency-adjustable frequency converter, said frequency converter having an analogous output at which an actual signal corresponding to the respective motor torque is output. The device further comprises a transmitter for the desired engine speed to whose input the desired signal is transmitted via an inverter. In said transmitter a curve is stored which describes a correlation between the motor torque and the engine speed in such a manner that the curve for the engine speed runs along a constant maximum value at small actual signal values and gradually decreases to a minimum value once a predetermined value for the actual signal is reached. The inventive device also comprises an attenuation step for the actual signal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/06; H02P 7/628

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 43/02 (2006.01); F04B 49/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/065 (2013.01); F04B 2203/0207 (2013.01); F04B 2207/044 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0034659A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29821910 U1 19990204; EP 1055071 A1 20001129; EP 1055071 B1 20040915; ES 2226450 T3 20050316; JP 2002531774 A 20020924; US 6344722 B1 20020205; WO 0034659 A1 20000615

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171103

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171023

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171215

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2226450 T3

2004-12-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910519 P 20041021

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031007

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE