Global Patent Index - EP 1055083 B1

EP 1055083 B1 2002-11-06 - COMBUSTOR FLOW CONTROLLER

Title (en)

COMBUSTOR FLOW CONTROLLER

Title (de)

BRENNKAMMERDURCHFLUSSMENGENREGLER

Title (fr)

REGULATEUR DE DEBIT DE CHAMBRE A COMBUSTION

Publication

EP 1055083 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98963641 A

Priority

  • GB 9803692 W
  • GB 9726697 A
  • GB 9726585 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9932827A1] A flow controller (5) for supplying air to a combustor and a combustor incorporating the same are disclosed. The flow controller comprising a conduit (6, 7, 8) and a control port (9), the conduit including a main section (8) dividing into at least two secondary sections (6, 7) at a junction and the control port being positioned in the conduit adjacent to the junction. In one embodiment, the control port is connected to a reservoir (10) wherein, in use, a change in the flow rate of a main airflow flowing through the main section of conduit causes a control airflow to flow either into or out of the control port whereby the main airflow is selectively diverted into one or other of the secondary sections of conduit. The main airflow may coanda around a surface of the main section. The control port may also be connected to the conduit further upstream of the junction so as to form a control loop (16). The main section of conduit may comprise a convergent-divergent duct.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 7/00; F15C 1/08; F23R 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15C 1/08 (2006.01); F23C 7/00 (2006.01); F23R 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/008 (2013.01); F15C 1/08 (2013.01); F23R 3/26 (2013.01); F05D 2270/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9932827 A1 19990701; AU 1884199 A 19990712; DE 69809295 D1 20021212; DE 69809295 T2 20030703; EP 1055083 A1 20001129; EP 1055083 B1 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121217

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69809295

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121217

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120105

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809295 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-09-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: QINETIQ LIMITED

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010312

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000603

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB