Global Patent Index - EP 1055086 A1

EP 1055086 A1 2000-11-29 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR A BURNER

Title (en)

CONTROL DEVICE FOR A BURNER

Title (de)

STEUEREINRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN BRENNER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR UN BRULEUR

Publication

EP 1055086 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99966846 A

Priority

  • DE 9903919 W
  • DE 19856954 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19856954C1] Control units (C1,C2) receive data relating to the switching state of the valves (V1,V2). The first control unit drives one of two switches (S1) of the first valve (V1), and also one of two switches (S2') of the second valve (V2). The second control unit (C2) drives the other switch (S1') of the first valve and the other switch (S2) of the second valve. The two control units receive data relating to the switching state of both valves. The two switches in each valve are different types of solid-state switch, such as a bipolar transistor and a field effect transistor (FET).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/242 (2013.01); F23N 2023/08 (2013.01); F23N 2035/14 (2013.01); F23N 2035/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0034716A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19856954 C1 20000511; BR 9907803 A 20001017; EP 1055086 A1 20001129; EP 1055086 B1 20030319; ES 2195657 T3 20031201; PL 342217 A1 20010521; WO 0034716 A1 20000615

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151209

2017-01-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170127

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151208

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151208

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151208

2015-06-03 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59904625

- Effective date: 20150423

2015-04-23 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59904625

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141212

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141216

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141215

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904625 P 20030424

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE