Global Patent Index - EP 1055096 A1

EP 1055096 A1 2000-11-29 - METHOD FOR INITIATING ARTILLERY PROPELLANT POWDER CHARGES, ARTILLERY PROPELLANT POWDER CHARGE MODULE AND ARTILLERY PROPELLANT POWDER CHARGE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR INITIATING ARTILLERY PROPELLANT POWDER CHARGES, ARTILLERY PROPELLANT POWDER CHARGE MODULE AND ARTILLERY PROPELLANT POWDER CHARGE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ZÜNDEN VON GESCHÜTZTREIBLADUNGEN, GESCHÜTZTREIBLADUNGSMODUL UND GESCHÜTZTREIBLADUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'AMORçAGE DE CHARGES DE POUDRE PROPULSIVE D'ARTILLERIE, MODULE DE CHARGE DE POUDRE PROPULSIVE D'ARTILLERIE ET DE CHARGE DE POUDRE PROPULSIVE D'ARTILLERIE

Publication

EP 1055096 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99973494 A

Priority

  • SE 9901971 W
  • SE 9804400 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0037879A1] The present invention relates to a method for avoiding uneven ignition when initiating artillery propellant powder charges (1) which comprise a plurality of partial charges of the so-called modular type and which are initiated by means of laser initiation systems or conventional ignition cartridges. The invention also includes artillery propellant powder charge modules designed in accordance with this method. The invention is also based on the fact that each such charge module or modular charge has on the one hand been provided with an initiating charge (18, 19) at each end of the central ignition channel (11), where this initiating charge can consist for example of black powder, and, on the other hand, the middle part of the same ignition channel has been provided with a specially designed firing unit (14) consisting of a number of ring elements between which narrow ignition gaps (17) are maintained.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 5/16 (2006.01); F42B 5/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 5/16 (2013.01); F42B 5/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0037879A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0037879 A1 20000629; WO 0037879 A8 20000928; DE 69925247 D1 20050616; DE 69925247 T2 20060223; EP 1055096 A1 20001129; EP 1055096 B1 20050511; ES 2242454 T3 20051101; IL 137908 A 20040104; IL 137908 D0 20011031; SE 512205 C2 20000214; SE 9804400 L 20000214; US 6415715 B1 20020709; ZA 200004182 B 20010606

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121104

2014-03-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140305

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121103

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69925247

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-08-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121103

2013-08-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121103

2013-06-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130601

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20111125

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20111129

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-05-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060214

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2242454 T3

2005-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69925247 P 20050616

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB NL

2005-05-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB NL

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020703

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI