Global patent index - EP 1055130 A1

EP 1055130 A1 2000-11-29 - ELECTRICAL PARAMETER MONITORING SYSTEM

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL PARAMETER MONITORING SYSTEM

Title (de)

ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM FÜR ELEKTRISCHE PARAMETER

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE SURVEILLANCE DE PARAMETRES ELECTRIQUES

Publication

EP 1055130 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98960930 A

Priority

  • AU 9801073 W
  • AU PP110497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9934224A1] A monitoring system for monitoring parameters of an apparatus, comprising a plurality of inputs for receiving a plurality of electrical analog signals representative of parameters of the apparatus, a multiplexing circuit for multiplexing the analog signals into sequential analog input signals, an auto-ranging circuit for individually scaling each of the sequential analog input signals to within a predetermined range suitable for digital processing thereof, a signal converter for converting the scaled sequential analog input signals into respective digital signals, and digital processing system for storing and/or manipulating the digital signals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01R 27/02; G01R 31/36; G06F 17/40; H01M 10/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01R 31/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01R 31/3648 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9934224 A1 19990708; AU PP110497 D0 19980122; CA 2315678 A1 19990708; CN 1285042 A 20010221; EP 1055130 A1 20001129; EP 1055130 A4 20010516

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030701

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TELSTRA NEW WAVE PTY LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010329

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TELSTRA R & D MANAGEMENT PTY LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000707;LT PAYMENT 20000707;LV PAYMENT 20000707;MK PAYMENT 20000707;RO PAYMENT 20000802;SI PAYMENT 20000802