Global Patent Index - EP 1055158 A1

EP 1055158 A1 2000-11-29 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING PERSONAL DATA

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PROCESSING PERSONAL DATA

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VERARBEITUNG VON PERSÖNLICHEN DATEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES PERSONNELLES

Publication

EP 1055158 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98906228 A

Priority

US 9802407 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2320183A1] A system for recording designated physical activity during the period of activity by means of a digital timepiece (10) carried by an athlete or user for subsequent playback after the activity via an audible transmission link (12, 14, 18, 20) to a digital computer (16) for processing, analysis and display (22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 47/00; A61B 5/00; A61B 5/02; A61B 5/024; A61B 5/0404

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/00 (2006.01); A61B 5/02 (2006.01); A61B 5/024 (2006.01); A61B 5/0404 (2006.01); G04B 47/00 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

AU 6150798 A 19990830; CA 2320183 A1 19990819; CA 2320183 C 20061219; EP 1055158 A1 20001129; EP 1055158 A4 20040707

INPADOC legal status


2009-03-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080830

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040921

2004-07-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 04B 47/00 A

2004-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61B 5/02 B

2004-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61B 5/024 B

2004-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61B 5/0404 B

2004-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61B 5/00 B

2003-08-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: POLAR ELECTRO OY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL