Global Patent Index - EP 1055160 A1

EP 1055160 A1 2000-11-29 - ELECTRONIC CONTROL ARRANGEMENT WITH REMOVABLE MEMORY MODULE

Title (en)

ELECTRONIC CONTROL ARRANGEMENT WITH REMOVABLE MEMORY MODULE

Title (de)

ELEKTRONISCHE STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT ABNEHMBAREM SPEICHERMODUL

Title (fr)

AGENCEMENT DE COMMANDE ELECTRONIQUE AVEC MODULE DE MEMOIRE AMOVIBLE

Publication

EP 1055160 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99966052 A

Priority

  • US 9929084 W
  • US 20911398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0034835A1] A control unit for use in an electronic control arrangement that includes a protective device for protecting a load. The control unit may communicate with a separate arrangement controller, and includes a removable non-volatile memory module comprising application specific settings storable thereon and associated with the load, thereby permitting the replacement of the control unit while the memory module from the original control unit, insertable in the replacement control unit, retains all of its application specific settings stored thereon. In an alternative embodiment, the protective device may include the removable non-volatile memory module.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05B 19/042

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05B 19/042 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05B 19/042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0034835A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0034835 A1 20000615; WO 0034835 A9 20010510; CN 1290360 A 20010404; EP 1055160 A1 20001129; HU 0102030 A2 20010928; HU 0102030 A3 20021028

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20040607

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030414

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE