Global Patent Index - EP 1055186 A1

EP 1055186 A1 2000-11-29 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING PROCESSES

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING PROCESSES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM KONTROLLIEREN VON PROZESSEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE REGULATION DE PROCEDES

Publication

EP 1055186 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99911511 A

Priority

  • AU 9900098 W
  • US 2710198 A
  • US 2709898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942939A1] A method and computer system for controlling an industrial process are disclosed. The industrial process has problems which adversely affect its performance. A personal computer is programmed with a database and a custom application. The database contains data describing the attributes and performance of the process to be controlled. The custom application calculates the financial value of each of the problems. The calculation of the financial value of each problem can take into account market conditions which affect the amount of product which could be sold if made, the marginal profitability of the product, how much optimum process time each problem takes up and the cost and quantity of raw materials wasted due to the problem. The calculation of the financial value of each problem can take into account the impact of each problem on the process bottleneck. The financial values of the problems are used to prioritise the problems, allowing them to be remedied in accordance with their priority.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05B 19/418 (2006.01); G06Q 10/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/04 (2013.01); G06Q 10/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942939 A1 19990826; AU 3018199 A 19990906; AU 724154 B2 20000914; CA 2321283 A1 19990826; CN 1291312 A 20010411; EP 1055186 A1 20001129; EP 1055186 A4 20011107; GB 2337835 A 19991201; GB 2337835 B 20000719; GB 9917270 D0 19990922; JP 2002504726 A 20020212

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030902

2001-11-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: THOMPSON, IAN, CHETWYND

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VAN DER VEGT, ANTON, HANS

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: THOMPSON, IAN, CHETWYND

2001-03-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VAN DER VEGT, ANTON, HANS

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE