Global Patent Index - EP 1055188 A1

EP 1055188 A1 2000-11-29 - A SENSING DEVICE AND A METHOD RELATING THERETO

Title (en)

A SENSING DEVICE AND A METHOD RELATING THERETO

Title (de)

SENSORVORRICHTUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

DETECTEUR ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1055188 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99932531 A

Priority

  • SE 9900195 W
  • SE 9800449 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9941696A1] The present invention relates to a capacitive sensing device (10) for sensing topological variations in the structure of an object such as e.g. a finger. The device comprises a sensing surface for receiving the object adjacent thereto and a number of sensor elements (11,1, ..., 1x,y) arranged in at least two dimensions (x, y). The sensing device further includes controlling means (2, 3) for providing control signals to the sensor elements (11,1, ..., 1x,y) and for at least a number of the sensor elements at least two functionalities are available. The sensor elements can be brought to take on one of said at least two different functionalities, and the actual functionality of a sensor element is determined by said control signal. The invention also relates to a data carrier comprising such a capacitive sensing device, and to a method for use of such a device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 9/00; G01B 7/004; G01B 7/287; G07C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 7/28 (2006.01); G01B 7/004 (2006.01); G01B 7/34 (2006.01); G06K 9/00 (2006.01); G06T 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01B 7/004 (2013.01); G01B 7/34 (2013.01); G06K 9/0002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941696A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9941696 A1 19990819; AU 3282199 A 19990830; DE 69922170 D1 20041230; DE 69922170 T2 20051201; EP 1055188 A1 20001129; EP 1055188 B1 20041124; JP 2002503818 A 20020205; JP 4351387 B2 20091028; SE 511543 C2 19991018; SE 9800449 D0 19980216; SE 9800449 L 19990817; US 6778686 B1 20040817

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170210

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69922170

2005-12-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-05-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-12-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69922170 P 20041230

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR NL

2004-11-24 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041124

2004-11-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041124

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040405

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000829

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR NL