Global Patent Index - EP 1055204 B1

EP 1055204 B1 2001-12-12 - DEVICE FOR WITHDRAWING BANK NOTE BUNDLES AND MAKING THEM AVAILABLE AT A CASH WITHDRAWAL STATION

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR WITHDRAWING BANK NOTE BUNDLES AND MAKING THEM AVAILABLE AT A CASH WITHDRAWAL STATION

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTNAHME VON BANKNOTENBÜNDELN UND BEREITSTELLUNG AN EINER ENTNAHMESTELLE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LE RETRAIT DE LIASSES DE BILLETS DE BANQUE ET LEUR MISE A DISPOSITION A UN POSTE DISTRIBUTEUR

Publication

EP 1055204 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99906036 A

Priority

  • DE 9900028 W
  • DE 19806029 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19806029C1] A device for withdrawing bundles of bank notes from a number of bank note magazines (12, 14, 16) stacked in a housing (10) and equipped with a separating device, and for making the bundles of bank notes available at a discharge opening (32), comprises a lift (19) with a container (28) for receiving the bundles of bank notes. The separating device and the lift (19) are independently driven. The container (28) has a single receiving position (29) common to all bank note magazines (12, 14, 16) and located below the lowermost bank note magazine (16), in front of its discharge opening (18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 11/0006 (2013.01); G07D 11/0003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19806029 C1 19990902; EP 1055204 A1 20001129; EP 1055204 B1 20011212; ES 2169944 T3 20020716; US 6505755 B1 20030114; WO 9941711 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090112

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090111

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090202

2010-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090112

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090112

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090111

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090111

2009-09-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080126

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-03-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-12-26 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2003-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-12 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2003-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF INTERNATIONAL GMBH

2002-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169944 T3

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ALTHOFF PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH ES FR GB IT LI SE

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010504

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH ES FR GB IT LI SE