Global Patent Index - EP 1055208 A1

EP 1055208 A1 2000-11-29 - DISPENSING DEVICE FOR FLAT ARTICLES

Title (en)

DISPENSING DEVICE FOR FLAT ARTICLES

Title (de)

ABGABEVORRICHTUNG FÜR FLACHE ARTIKEL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION POUR ARTICLES PLATS

Publication

EP 1055208 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99902940 A

Priority

  • NL 9900062 W
  • NL 1008242 A
  • NL 1010814 A
  • NL 1010947 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9940550A1] A dispensing device for individually dispensing one substantially flat article at a time, such as a newspaper, a magazine or the like, comprises: a housing with a dispensing opening; a support arranged in this housing for carrying a stack of articles and at least one drive roller which is present on the end zone of the support directed toward the dispensing opening and is drivable by a user by means of drive means which can be energized via operating means, which roller has at least a jacket having a high coefficient of friction in common with the relevant outer surface of each article, for instance of a soft rubber or rubbery material; wherein between the article for sliding off the stack for dispensing from this stack and the adjacent article there exists a certain minimal static friction to be overcome by the drive roller for dispensing, which friction is overcome for dispensing by driving the drive roller at sufficiently high initial speed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 11/04; B65H 3/56; G07F 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/04 (2006.01); B65H 3/06 (2006.01); G07F 11/04 (2006.01); G07F 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/06 (2013.01); B65H 1/04 (2013.01); G07F 11/045 (2013.01); G07F 11/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940550A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9940550 A1 19990812; AU 2302899 A 19990823; EP 1055208 A1 20001129

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041223

2001-10-24 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NEWS POINT B.V.

2001-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEWS POINT B.V.

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE