Global Patent Index - EP 1055228 A1

EP 1055228 A1 2000-11-29 - SPEECH OPERATED AUTOMATIC INQUIRY SYSTEM

Title (en)

SPEECH OPERATED AUTOMATIC INQUIRY SYSTEM

Title (de)

AUTOMATISCHES SPRACHGESTEUERTES ABFRAGESYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE RENSEIGNEMENTS AUTOMATIQUE A COMMANDE VOCALE

Publication

EP 1055228 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99965413 A

Priority

  • EP 99965413 A
  • EP 9909263 W
  • EP 98204286 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0036591A1] An automatic inquiry system includes a storage (52) for storing a plurality of inquiry entries, each entry comprising a plurality of data fields. For at least one data field of each inquiry entry a respective reference transcription set is stored which includes at least two alternative acoustic transcriptions of data stored in the data field. A dialogue engine (50) executes a human-machine dialogue to determine a plurality of pre-determined query fields. Instead of fully recognizing all utterances, a speech recognizer (40) is able to represent at least one utterance as a corresponding input transcription set, which includes at least two alternative acoustic transcriptions of the utterance. The dialogue engine (50) specifies at least a first one of the query fields by an input transcription set of a selected one of the utterances. A search engine (59) locates inquiry entries in the storage whose associated reference transcription set relates to the first one of the query fields. In this way, utterances, such as specifying family names, which are difficult to recognize accurately need not be fully recognized before a query is made.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 15/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G10L 15/14 (2006.01); G10L 15/22 (2006.01); H04M 3/493 (2006.01); G10L 15/18 (2013.01); G10L 15/183 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30672 (2013.01); G06F 17/30286 (2013.01); G06F 17/30746 (2013.01); G10L 15/22 (2013.01); H04M 3/4931 (2013.01); G10L 15/18 (2013.01); G10L 15/183 (2013.01); G10L 2015/085 (2013.01); H04M 2201/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0036591A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0036591 A1 20000622; EP 1055228 A1 20001129; JP 2002532763 A 20021002

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040508

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-07-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCANSOFT, INC.

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030212

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE