Global patent index - EP 1055241 A1

EP 1055241 A1 2000-11-29 - TRANSPORT CONTAINER FOR NUCLEAR FUEL ASSEMBLIES

Title (en)

TRANSPORT CONTAINER FOR NUCLEAR FUEL ASSEMBLIES

Title (de)

TRANSPORTBEHÄLTER FÜR KERNBRENNSTABBÜNDEL

Title (fr)

CONTENEUR DE TRANSPORT POUR DES ASSEMBLAGES DE COMBUSTIBLE NUCLEAIRE

Publication

EP 1055241 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99901693 A

Priority

  • FR 9900218 W
  • FR 9801553 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2774800A1] The invention concerns a container comprising an external casing and an internal structure defining at least a housing (13a, 13b) for receiving and maintaining a fuel assembly (16a, 16b). The container internal structure (10) comprises walls mutually assembled such that the at least one housing (13a, 13b) receiving and maintaining the fuel assembly (16a, 16b) is completely closed along its lateral surfaces and at the longitudinal ends and that the internal structure (10) ensures the maintenance, protection and confinement of the fuel assembly independently of the external casing. The internal structure (10) walls 12a, 12b, 14a, 14b) are double walls filled with a neutron absorbing resin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21F 5/008

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21F 5/008 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21F 5/008 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/303 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/305 (2013.01); G21Y 2004/303 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941754A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2774800 A1 19990813; FR 2774800 B1 20000505; CN 1128451 C 20031119; CN 1296625 A 20010523; DE 69903922 D1 20021219; DE 69903922 T2 20030911; EP 1055241 A1 20001129; EP 1055241 B1 20021113; ES 2187137 T3 20030516; JP 2002503821 A 20020205; JP 4322423 B2 20090902; US 6580085 B1 20030617; WO 9941754 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160212

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160301

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160212

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-08-10 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2007-08-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2187137

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69903922

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-19

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAMATOME ANP

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011011

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000807

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB LI SE