Global Patent Index - EP 1055246 A1

EP 1055246 A1 2000-11-29 - ELECTRONIC TUBE GRID WITH AXIAL BEAM

Title (en)

ELECTRONIC TUBE GRID WITH AXIAL BEAM

Title (de)

GITTER FÜR ELEKTRONENRÖHRE MIT AXIALEM STRAHLENBÜNDEL

Title (fr)

GRILLE POUR TUBE ELECTRONIQUE A FAISCEAU AXIAL

Publication

EP 1055246 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99902588 A

Priority

  • FR 9900171 W
  • FR 9801760 A
  • FR 9802202 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2775118A1] The invention concerns an electronic tube grid with axial beam (50), comprising an open-worked part (23) designed to be traversed by the beam (50) electrons. The grid is shaped like a bell (22) and is made of a single material. The open-worked part (23) is located at the bell top (21) but is placed at the base of a hollow part so that the electrons passing through the grid at its periphery are focused on the axis. The invention is particularly applicable to IOT.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 19/38; H01J 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 23/065 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 23/065 (2013.01); H01J 2225/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941762A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2775118 A1 19990820; FR 2775118 B1 20000505; CA 2319620 A1 19990819; CA 2319620 C 20100803; CN 100346443 C 20071031; CN 1290398 A 20010404; DE 69930836 D1 20060524; EP 1055246 A1 20001129; EP 1055246 B1 20060412; HK 1036148 A1 20080328; US 6635978 B1 20031021; WO 9941762 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160212

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160212

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070115

2006-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060727

2006-07-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69930836 P 20060524

2006-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-04-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-04-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060412

2005-12-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES ELECTRON DEVICES S.A.

2005-02-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050113

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT