Global patent index - EP 1055270 A1

EP 1055270 A1 2000-11-29 - LAMP SOCKET

Title (en)

LAMP SOCKET

Title (de)

LAMPENFASSUNG

Title (fr)

DOUILLE DE LAMPE

Publication

EP 1055270 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99910209 A

Priority

  • DE 19805258 A
  • EP 9900836 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19805258A1] The invention relates to an especially shallow socket for all-purpose filament bulbs and energy-saving bulbs with integrated ballast, the connections of which are arranged in a circle outside the protective collar of the sockets. When energy-saving bulbs are inserted into light fittings, said socket is able at least partly to compensate for the extra length of such bulbs in relation to filament bulbs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 33/22; H01R 33/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/22 (2006.01); H01R 33/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/22 (2013.01); H01R 33/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941811A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19805258 A1 19990819; DE 19805258 C2 20020711; CN 1127789 C 20031112; CN 1290414 A 20010404; EP 1055270 A1 20001129; EP 1055270 B1 20020522; ES 2177257 T3 20021201; RU 2193809 C2 20021127; WO 9941811 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status

2006-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050210

2005-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-02-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050210

2005-02-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050209

2004-02-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040212

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040121

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030225

2003-01-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2177257

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2002-09-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020822

2002-08-22 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020822

2002-08-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020822

2002-05-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-05-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-05-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020522

2001-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001214

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT NL PT SE