Global patent index - EP 1055281 A1

EP 1055281 A1 2000-11-29 - ELECTROSTATIC MICROACTUATOR FOR OPTICAL MICROSWITCHES

Title (en)

ELECTROSTATIC MICROACTUATOR FOR OPTICAL MICROSWITCHES

Title (de)

ELEKTROSTATISCHER MIKROANTRIEB FÜR MIKROOPTISCHE SCHALTER

Title (fr)

MICRO-ACTUATEUR ELECTROSTATIQUE POUR MICRO-COMMUTATEURS OPTIQUES

Publication

EP 1055281 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99902194 A

Priority

  • US 9900648 W
  • US 7103898 P
  • US 9680698 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937013A1] An optical microswitch (104) for use with a laser beam that extends along a path comprising a body (213) having an inlet port (150) adapted to receive the laser beam and a plurality of outlet ports (151). A plurality of mirrors (103) coupled to a plurality of micromotors (180a, 180b) are carried by the body. The micromotors selectively move the mirrors from a first position out of the path of the laser beam to a second position into the path of the laser beam to direct the laser beam to one of the outlet ports. Each of the micromotors has at least one electrostatically-driven comb assembly therein for moving the respective mirror to one of the first and second positions. A controller is electrically coupled to the micromotors for providing control signals to the micromotors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02N 1/00; G02B 6/26; G11B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/35 (2006.01); G02B 6/42 (2006.01); G02B 26/08 (2006.01); G11B 7/00 (2006.01); G11B 7/135 (2012.01); G11B 11/105 (2006.01); H02N 1/00 (2006.01); G11B 7/12 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/3518 (2013.01); G02B 6/4216 (2013.01); G02B 26/0833 (2013.01); G02B 26/0841 (2013.01); G11B 7/122 (2013.01); G11B 7/1384 (2013.01); G11B 11/10543 (2013.01); H02N 1/008 (2013.01); G02B 6/3546 (2013.01); G02B 6/3548 (2013.01); G02B 6/3566 (2013.01); G02B 6/357 (2013.01); G02B 6/358 (2013.01); G02B 6/3584 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937013 A1 19990722; WO 9937013 A9 19991007; AU 2223299 A 19990802; CA 2318060 A1 19990722; CN 1292945 A 20010425; EP 1055281 A1 20001129; EP 1055281 A4 20030611; JP 2002510059 A 20020402; MY 133235 A 20071031; TW 419602 B 20010121

INPADOC legal status

2006-04-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051018

2005-06-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: ELECTROSTATIC MICROACTUATOR FOR OPTICAL MICROSWITCHES

2004-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040527

2003-06-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 02N 1/00 A

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 11B 7/00 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 02B 6/26 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 02B 26/08 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 02B 6/35 B

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IOLON, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY LLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE