Global Patent Index - EP 1055354 A1

EP 1055354 A1 2000-11-29 - METHOD AND INDUCTION FURNACE FOR MELTING A METALLIC OR METAL-CONTAINING BULK MATERIAL IN THE SHAPE OF SMALL PIECES

Title (en)

METHOD AND INDUCTION FURNACE FOR MELTING A METALLIC OR METAL-CONTAINING BULK MATERIAL IN THE SHAPE OF SMALL PIECES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND INDUKTIONSOFEN ZUM SCHMELZEN VON KLEINSTÜCKIGEM METALL- UND/ODER METALLHALTIGEM SCHÜTTGUT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET FOUR A INDUCTION POUR FAIRE FONDRE UN PRODUIT EN VRAC EN PETITS MORCEAUX, EN METAL ET/OU A BASE DE METAL

Publication

EP 1055354 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99908749 A

Priority

  • DE 9900192 W
  • DE 19805644 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19805644A1] The present invention relates to a method as well as to an induction furnace for continuously melting a metallic or metal-containing bulk material in the shape of small pieces. The metallic bulk material is supplied from the top onto the melt located in the vessel of the furnace. An stirring movement is applied to the melt located in the upper area using an alternating field produced by a first magnetic coil (induction coil 11) which is arranged around the furnace vessel. Heat is simultaneously supplied to the melt, used as a short-circuited secondary winding, in the lower region of the induction-furnace crucible (13) about the iron core (16) of a low-frequency transformer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 6/34; H05B 6/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F27D 11/06 (2006.01); H05B 6/20 (2006.01); H05B 6/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/20 (2013.01); H05B 6/34 (2013.01); H05B 2213/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941951A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19805644 A1 19990826; DE 19805644 C2 20010322; EP 1055354 A1 20001129; EP 1055354 B1 20020612; JP 2002503875 A 20020205; US 6240120 B1 20010529; WO 9941951 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110122

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100122

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100122

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090115

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030313

2002-09-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901727

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-18

2002-07-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2002-06-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010629

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT