Global patent index - EP 1055383 A2

EP 1055383 A2 2000-11-29 - Convertible display stand and travel case

Title (en)

Convertible display stand and travel case

Title (de)

In ein Schaustand umwandelbarer Reisebehälter

Title (fr)

Etui de voyage convertible en présentoir

Publication

EP 1055383 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00303494 A

Priority

US 32042299 A

Abstract (en)

A combined display stand and travel case which may be utilized with items such as razors, jewelry or tools. The case is movable from a closed position which encloses the item to be carried and protects that item during transit or storage. The case is movable to a second, open position in which the item may be removed from the case or maintained in a standing, uncovered position within the case. Preferably, the case comprises one piece and does not require any assembly by the user. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 7/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 21/40 (2006.01); A45D 27/22 (2006.01); A45D 27/29 (2006.01); A47F 1/14 (2006.01); A47F 7/03 (2006.01); B65D 77/24 (2006.01); B65D 85/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 27/29 (2013.01); A47F 7/03 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055383 A2 20001129; EP 1055383 A3 20010523; AU 3538100 A 20001130; CA 2305111 A1 20001126; JP 2001002132 A 20010109

INPADOC legal status

2004-09-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030822

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010706

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47F 7/03 A, 7A 45D 27/22 B

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI