Global Patent Index - EP 1055436 A2

EP 1055436 A2 2000-11-29 - Modular biscuits shaped like puzzle elements

Title (en)

Modular biscuits shaped like puzzle elements

Title (de)

Zusammensetzbare, als Puzzleteile gestaltete Kekse

Title (fr)

Biscuits modulaires en forme de pièces de puzzle

Publication

EP 1055436 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00104177 A

Priority

IT MI991191 A

Abstract (en)

A kit of biscuits and similar dry food products, for infancy consumption, wherein the biscuits (1 to 4) are provided on their peripheral portions with means (1a-4a; 1b-4b) for mutual removable engagement, and are provided on their surface with drawings or portions of drawings (S), so as to form respective elements of a puzzle game. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 9/10 (2013.01); A63F 2250/022 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055436 A2 20001129; EP 1055436 A3 20010829; IT MI991191 A1 20001129; IT MI991191 D0 19990528

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-06-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 63F 9/10 A

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI