Global Patent Index - EP 1055465 A3

EP 1055465 A3 2001-04-18 - Method and apparatus for deep drawing sheet metal plates

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for deep drawing sheet metal plates

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Tiefziehen von Blechformteilen

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour l'emboutissage profond de tôles

Publication

EP 1055465 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00110779 A

Priority

DE 19923540 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1055465A2] A deep drawing process in which formed sheet parts are locally annealed in the deep drawing press is new. An Independent claim is also included for a deep drawing press equipped with a heater (6) for carrying out the above proces

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 22/22; B21D 22/20; B21D 37/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/20 (2006.01); B21D 24/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/20 (2013.01); B21D 24/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1055465 A2 20001129; EP 1055465 A3 20010418; EP 1055465 B1 20021218; DE 19923540 A1 20001207; ES 2188446 T3 20030701

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070520

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070521

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070521

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070521

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070520

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070520

2008-01-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060530

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060522

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060512

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188446 T3

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-25 [REG SE TRCL] SWEDISH TRANSLATION OF THE CLAIMS HAVE BEEN FILED

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000953 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000953 P 20030130

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21D 22/22 A, 7B 21D 37/16 B, 7B 21D 22/20 B

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI